LA HB676 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Early Childhood Care and Education Commission and pilot programs for community early childhood care and education networks (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Early Childhood Care and Education Commission and pilot programs for community early childhood care and education networks (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. John Bagneris [D]
Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Ken Brass [D]
Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Robert Carter [D]
Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Paula Davis [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]
Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Jeff Hall [D]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]
Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]
Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Nancy Landry [R]Rep. Walt Leger [D]
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]
Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]
Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]
Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]
Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Wesley Bishop [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Norby Chabert [R]
Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Jack Donahue [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]
Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]
Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]
Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Neil Riser [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 676 ADOPT (#1378) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 676 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1377) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 676 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1073) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 676 FINAL PASSAGE (#792) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 676 CO-AUTHORS (#791) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 676 FINAL PASSAGE (#210) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseEffective date: See Act.
2018-05-31HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 639.
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2018-05-18SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays.
2018-05-18SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2018-05-18HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2018-05-18HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18.
2018-05-17HouseNotice given.
2018-05-17HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
2018-05-16HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2018-05-16SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Morrish, Mizell, and Appel.
2018-05-16HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2018-05-15SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2018-05-15SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2018-05-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Hilferty, Nancy Landry, and Thomas.
2018-05-15HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2018-05-15HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18.
2018-05-08HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-07SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-02SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-01SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-30SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/02/18.
2018-03-26HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-22HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB676&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073219
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078392
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081697
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099564
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103413
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078327
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077417
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077412
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079178
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078625
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094984
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097178
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073261
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076183
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078482
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081770
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082085
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092382
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098028
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107230
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081637
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093880
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093881
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099331
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099405

Bill Comments

feedback