LA HB676 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits sanctuary policies (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Prohibits sanctuary policies (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 676 FINAL PASSAGE (#342) (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 676 FINAL PASSAGE (#243) (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 676 AMENDMENT # 2342 BY LEGER MOTION TO ADOPT (#242) (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 676 FINAL PASSAGE (#243) (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 676 AMENDMENT # 2342 BY LEGER MOTION TO ADOPT (#242) (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 32. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17. |
2017-05-11 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-11 | House | Notice removed |
2017-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17. |
2017-05-10 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 32. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/17. |
2017-05-01 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 135 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (8-7). |
Same As/Similar To
HB135 (Replaces) 2017-04-27 - Becomes HB 676.