LA HB671 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to authorized payroll withholdings for professional organization dues and certain contracts with school boards (OR INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to authorized payroll withholdings for professional organization dues and certain contracts with school boards (OR INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/18. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |