LA HB671 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to redispensing of drugs in correctional facility pharmacies
Title
Provides relative to redispensing of drugs in correctional facility pharmacies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 671 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#856) (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 671 FINAL PASSAGE (#678) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 671 FINAL PASSAGE (#355) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 671 FINAL PASSAGE (#678) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 671 FINAL PASSAGE (#355) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 310. |
2016-05-24 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-19 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 69, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016. |
2016-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2016. |
2016-04-14 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-04-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/14/2016. |
2016-04-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |