LA HB667 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Shreveport Implementation and Redevelopment Authority
Title
Provides relative to the Shreveport Implementation and Redevelopment Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Glover [D] | Rep. Kenny Cox [D] | Rep. Marcus Hunter [D] | Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D] |
Sen. Samuel Jenkins [D] | Rep. Barbara Norton [D] | Rep. Vincent Pierre [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 667 FINAL PASSAGE (#469) (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2017-04-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2017-04-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |