LA HB664 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Notice removed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Notice removed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provision of law regarding the prohibition on subsequent bail obligations following revocation or forfeiture
Title
Repeals provision of law regarding the prohibition on subsequent bail obligations following revocation or forfeiture
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Notice removed. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 19, 2010. | |
2010-05-13 | Notice given. | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 13, 2010. | |
2010-05-07 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-06 | Reported favorably (8-5) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled. |