LA HB661 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to charter boat fishing guide licensing
Title
Provides relative to charter boat fishing guide licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 661 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1174) (Y: 73 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#218) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#218) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 442. |
2024-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-21 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 73, nays 11. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2024-05-20 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/21/2024. |
2024-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 17. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |