LA HB661 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides for Type 3B charter schools and provides for charter school funding (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Creates and provides for Type 3B charter schools and provides for charter school funding (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 661 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#836) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#877) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#877) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 661 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 330. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/04/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2013. |
2013-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2013. |
2013-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |