LA HB659 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:00 pm in John J. Hainkel, Jr. Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:00 pm in John J. Hainkel, Jr. Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases certain penalties relative to certain prohibited actions regarding tax sale property (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Increases certain penalties relative to certain prohibited actions regarding tax sale property (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 659 FINAL PASSAGE (#316) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |