LA HB658 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to notifications prior to administrative revocation of a license (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to notifications prior to administrative revocation of a license (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 658 FINAL PASSAGE (#671) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 658 FINAL PASSAGE (#503) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 658 FINAL PASSAGE (#503) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 487. |
2024-05-16 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-15 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |