LA HB656 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of Interstate 220 in Shreveport and Caddo Parish as the "Minnion Dewayne Jackson Memorial Overpass"
Title
Designates a portion of Interstate 220 in Shreveport and Caddo Parish as the "Minnion Dewayne Jackson Memorial Overpass"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 656 FINAL PASSAGE (#939) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 656 FINAL PASSAGE (#690) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 656 FINAL PASSAGE (#690) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 354. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |