LA HB653 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for voting and voting processes and procedures, including provisions relative to the standards, requirement, and acquisition of voting machines and systems

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for voting and voting processes and procedures, including provisions relative to the standards, requirement, and acquisition of voting machines and systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 653 FINAL PASSAGE (#420) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-12HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021.
2021-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-05HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB653&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212372
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221715
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224392
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220933
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221512
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221873
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222479
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212388
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221731
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224418
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224200

Bill Comments 750

feedback