LA HB647 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the La. Department of Health to implement the Medicaid health home option for persons with serious mental illness (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the La. Department of Health to implement the Medicaid health home option for persons with serious mental illness (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported favorably (12-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |