LA HB646 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-14 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an incentive expenditure forecast (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for an incentive expenditure forecast (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 646 FINAL PASSAGE (#334) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |