LA HB646 | 2011 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB175
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the verification of citizenship for employment (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the verification of citizenship for employment (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on HB 646, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#910) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 646, FINAL PASSAGE (#935) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 646, TO GRANT SENATE PERMISSION (#883) (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 646, 2/3 vote (#898) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 646, FINAL PASSAGE (#517) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 646, FINAL PASSAGE (#935) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 646, TO GRANT SENATE PERMISSION (#883) (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 646, 2/3 vote (#898) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 646, FINAL PASSAGE (#517) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-07-01 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 402. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2011-06-22 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-06-22 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-22 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-21 | By a vote of 87 yeas, 1 nays the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-20 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-20 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-20 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-19 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-06-13 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | |
2011-06-09 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 175 reported by the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (5-3). |
Same As/Similar To
HB175 (Replaces) 2011-06-07 - Becomes HB No. 646.