LA HB645 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to an internal claims and appeals process and external review procedures for health insurance issuers (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to an internal claims and appeals process and external review procedures for health insurance issuers (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 645 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#849) (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 645 FINAL PASSAGE (#903) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 645 FINAL PASSAGE (#249) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 645 FINAL PASSAGE (#903) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 645 FINAL PASSAGE (#249) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | House | Effective date: January 1, 2015. |
2013-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 326. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2013. |
2013-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |