LA HB643 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the supervision of parolees (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the supervision of parolees (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 643 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#775) (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 643 FINAL PASSAGE (#702) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 643 2/3 vote (#701) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 643 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#701) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 643 FINAL PASSAGE (#408) (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 203.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 72, nays 19, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-06-01HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-01SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-01HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-06-01SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 31 yeas and 5 nays.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31HouseBy a vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 15. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (7-2).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB643&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163908
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174266
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179055
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181936
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174114
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174248
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175522
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177534
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178801
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178926
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163938
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173983
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174417
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175422
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177750
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178207
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179307
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185865
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175690
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178389
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178779
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178780

Bill Comments

feedback