LA HB643 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-15-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the regulation of the adoption of children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the regulation of the adoption of children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 643 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1204) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 643 FINAL PASSAGE (#936) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 643 FINAL PASSAGE (#224) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 562.
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
2018-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-09SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-02SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-01SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2018-04-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/03/18.
2018-03-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-26HouseReported with amendments (6-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB643&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073046
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079120
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098327
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102772
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078721
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078583
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079091
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093556
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097021
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098251
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073132
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079194
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1105629
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082486
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094977

Bill Comments

feedback