LA HB642 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana State Board of Examiners in Dietetics and Nutrition
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana State Board of Examiners in Dietetics and Nutrition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 642 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1225) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 642 FINAL PASSAGE (#1149) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 642 FINAL PASSAGE (#1130) (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 642 AMENDMENT # 3704 BY MILLS RECONSIDER VOTE (#1129) (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 642 FINAL PASSAGE (#414) (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 642 FINAL PASSAGE (#1149) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 642 FINAL PASSAGE (#1130) (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 642 AMENDMENT # 3704 BY MILLS RECONSIDER VOTE (#1129) (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 642 FINAL PASSAGE (#414) (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 636. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2016-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 17 nays. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2016. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |