LA HB64 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Levies a state tax on the net revenue of fantasy sports contests (Item #17) (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levies a state tax on the net revenue of fantasy sports contests (Item #17) (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 64 FINAL PASSAGE (#96) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - House Vote on HB 64 FINAL PASSAGE (#65) (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-25HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-24HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-06-23SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-22SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-06-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-17HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 11. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/17/20.
2020-06-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-11HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-06-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-06-10HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-10HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB64&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181235
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181646
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182788
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183714
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181844
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181236
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181421
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181750
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181983
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182813
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183109
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184114
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182778
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183648

Bill Comments

feedback