LA HB637 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes an assessor to collect a fee from certain parties requesting assessment rolls or lists (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Title
Authorizes an assessor to collect a fee from certain parties requesting assessment rolls or lists (RE SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 637 HOUSE AND GOVERNMENT (#98) (Y: 9 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-13 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/13/2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-07 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2022-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2022. |
2022-04-06 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-04-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/06/2022. |
2022-04-04 | House | Notice given. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-04-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2022. |
2022-03-29 | House | Notice given. |
2022-03-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |