LA HB629 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 06/26/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 06/26/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds certain polyroll tubing to the definition of farm equipment for purposes of the state sales and use tax exemption for certain farm equipment (EN -$690,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Adds certain polyroll tubing to the definition of farm equipment for purposes of the state sales and use tax exemption for certain farm equipment (EN -$690,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. John Anders [D] | Rep. Christopher Broadwater [R] | Sen. James Fannin [R] | Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Sen. Michael Walsworth [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 629 ADOPT (#954) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 629 MOTION TO ADOPT (#930) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 629 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#815) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 629 FINAL PASSAGE (#651) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 629 FINAL PASSAGE (#408) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 629 MOTION TO ADOPT (#930) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 629 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#815) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 629 FINAL PASSAGE (#651) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 629 FINAL PASSAGE (#408) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Effective date: 06/26/17. |
2017-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 424. |
2017-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/17. |
2017-06-07 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2017-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Tarver, and Long. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Anders, Abramson, and Henry. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-16 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0), with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-04-17 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |