LA HB628 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-19 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the age limit for a child to accompany a parent or guardian into the voting machine (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for the age limit for a child to accompany a parent or guardian into the voting machine (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 628 FINAL PASSAGE (#486) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |