LA HB627 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the recommendation of medical marijuana for treating certain health conditions of persons with autism

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the recommendation of medical marijuana for treating certain health conditions of persons with autism

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 627 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1205) (Y: 59 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 627 FINAL PASSAGE (#947) (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 627 FINAL PASSAGE (#281) (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 627 AMENDMENT # 2294 BY HORTON MOTION TO ADOPT (#280) (Y: 12 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseEffective date: See Act.
2018-05-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 496.
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 59, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
2018-05-09HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-09SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-07SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-03SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-02SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-05HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18.
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-28HouseReported with amendments (9-4).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB627&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073041
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080161
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083626
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098316
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102016
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079176
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080045
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080921
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083021
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081825
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083565
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092577
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095119
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098341
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073131
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080497
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083691
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092694
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083566
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095019

Bill Comments

feedback