LA HB626 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates the Dept. of Revenue
Title
Re-creates the Dept. of Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-03-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 3/22/2012. | |
2012-03-14 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-03-13 | Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled. |