LA HB621 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the legislative auditor's access to information held by entities that provide services to public retirement systems
Title
Provides relative to the legislative auditor's access to information held by entities that provide services to public retirement systems
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 621 FINAL PASSAGE (#555) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2016. |
2016-04-27 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-27 | House | Notice removed |
2016-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. |
2016-04-20 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |