LA HB62 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date: 08/29/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date: 08/29/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for state income tax withholdings on unemployment compensation benefits (Item #32) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)
Title
Provides for state income tax withholdings on unemployment compensation benefits (Item #32) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 62 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#159) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 62 FINAL PASSAGE (#130) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote on HB 62 FINAL PASSAGE (#77) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 62 FINAL PASSAGE (#130) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Vote on HB 62 FINAL PASSAGE (#77) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Effective date: 08/29/2020. |
2020-07-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 33. |
2020-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-06-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-06-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/29/20. |
2020-06-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-06-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/18/20. |
2020-06-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported with amendments (13-1). |
2020-06-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-06-10 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |