LA HB618 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date: June 18, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-18 - Effective date: June 18, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to salary supplements for public school educational diagnosticians (EN INCREASE FF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to salary supplements for public school educational diagnosticians (EN INCREASE FF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 618 FINAL PASSAGE (#912) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 618 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 618 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 618 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 618 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | House | Effective date: June 18, 2013. |
2013-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 393. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-06 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/6/2013. |
2013-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |