LA HB616 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides for a program to provide funding for dual enrollment expenses for public high school students (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates and provides for a program to provide funding for dual enrollment expenses for public high school students (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2022-05-10 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |