LA HB616 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to foods and beverages, other than school breakfast or lunch, offered in public schools
Title
Provides relative to foods and beverages, other than school breakfast or lunch, offered in public schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 616 FINAL PASSAGE (#992) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 616 FINAL PASSAGE (#485) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 616 FINAL PASSAGE (#485) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 330. |
2018-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-10 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |