LA HB616 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to time requirements and responsibilities of public school governing authorities with regard to student assessments
Title
Provides relative to time requirements and responsibilities of public school governing authorities with regard to student assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 616 ADOPT (#953) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 616 MOTION TO ADOPT (#929) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 616 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#849) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 616 FINAL PASSAGE (#753) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 616 FINAL PASSAGE (#466) (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 616 MOTION TO ADOPT (#929) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 616 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#849) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 616 FINAL PASSAGE (#753) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 616 FINAL PASSAGE (#466) (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 364. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/17. |
2017-06-07 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2017-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrish, White, and Mizell. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Thomas, Nancy Landry, and Simon. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 2, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |