LA HB615 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to administrative hearings involving actions of the commissioner of insurance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to administrative hearings involving actions of the commissioner of insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 615 FINAL PASSAGE (#278) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-05HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18.
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-28HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback