LA HB612 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits use of TOPS awards at eligible La. institutions by otherwise qualified students who graduated from out-of-state colleges or universities (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Permits use of TOPS awards at eligible La. institutions by otherwise qualified students who graduated from out-of-state colleges or universities (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 612 FINAL PASSAGE (#127) (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 38. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/24/2013. |
2013-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported favorably (13-2) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |