LA HB610 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Effective date: 01/01/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Effective date: 01/01/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the inclusion of the value of certain federal tax credits and special financing provisions when determining the fair market value of certain property for purposes of tax assessment (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Prohibits the inclusion of the value of certain federal tax credits and special financing provisions when determining the fair market value of certain property for purposes of tax assessment (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 610 FINAL PASSAGE (#757) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 610 FINAL PASSAGE (#468) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 610 FINAL PASSAGE (#468) (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2017. |
2016-05-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 182. |
2016-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-12 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-12 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |