LA HB608 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to persons subject to the examination authority of the commissioner of insurance
Title
Provides relative to persons subject to the examination authority of the commissioner of insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 608 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#763) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 608 FINAL PASSAGE (#540) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 608 FINAL PASSAGE (#276) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 608 FINAL PASSAGE (#540) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Vote on HB 608 FINAL PASSAGE (#276) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: John Smith, Long, and Luneau. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-08 | House | House conferees appointed: Seabaugh, Talbot, and Huval. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/07/18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |