LA HB604 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-01 - Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to expungement of records (RR1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to expungement of records (RR1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 604 FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2021-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021. |
2021-05-19 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-19 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-05-03 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021. |
2021-04-28 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |