LA HB604 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the distribution and allocation of unspent federal funds available for recovery from Hurricanes Katrina and Rita (OR SEE FISC NOTE FF EX)
Title
To provide for the distribution and allocation of unspent federal funds available for recovery from Hurricanes Katrina and Rita (OR SEE FISC NOTE FF EX)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |