LA HB601 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-02 - Effective date: 06/02/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-02 - Effective date: 06/02/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits disclosure by the registrar of voters, clerk of court, and Department of State of information that, if disclosed, may compromise the security of the state voter registration computer system and election management system
Title
Prohibits disclosure by the registrar of voters, clerk of court, and Department of State of information that, if disclosed, may compromise the security of the state voter registration computer system and election management system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 601 ADOPT (#1359) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 601 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1368) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 601 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1153) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 601 FINAL PASSAGE (#946) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 601 FINAL PASSAGE (#369) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 601 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1368) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 601 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1153) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 601 FINAL PASSAGE (#946) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 601 FINAL PASSAGE (#369) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-02 | House | Effective date: 06/02/2018. |
2018-06-02 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 712. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18. |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Walsworth, and Hewitt. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | House conferees appointed: Shadoin, Pugh, and Gregory Miller. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-05-16 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/18. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |