LA HB600 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Levies a state tax on the net gaming proceeds of fantasy sports contests, and authorizes a fee for issuance of certain licenses or permits (RE2 +$346,500 SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levies a state tax on the net gaming proceeds of fantasy sports contests, and authorizes a fee for issuance of certain licenses or permits (RE2 +$346,500 SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 600 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1061) (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 600 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#998) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 600 FINAL PASSAGE (#966) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 600 AMENDMENT # 3410 BY CORTEZ HB 600 BY TALBOT (#965) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 600 MOTION TO CONSIDER AFTER 57TH DAY (#951) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 600 2/3 vote (#937) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 600 FINAL PASSAGE (#901) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 600 AMENDMENT # 3289 BY WHITE HB 600 BY TALBOT (#900) (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 600 AMENDMENT # 3260 BY MARTINY HB 600 BY TALBOT (#899) (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 600 FINAL PASSAGE (#496) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 73, nays 21. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-06HouseRules suspended.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee report received.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-05SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Cortez, and Martiny.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Talbot, Abramson, and Stefanski.
2019-06-05SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-06-05HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 85, nays 0. The Senate amendments, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
2019-06-04HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/05/19.
2019-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-04SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-04SenateReconsidered.
2019-06-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-06-04SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
2019-06-04HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 57th legislative day.
2019-06-04HouseRules suspended.
2019-06-04HouseBy a vote of 88 yeas, 1 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
2019-06-04SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays.
2019-06-03SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2019-06-03SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title. By a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays, the bill failed to receive the required two-thirds vote.
2019-06-03SenateRules suspended.
2019-06-01SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-31SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-29SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-29SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-23SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 16. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-14HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-06HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB600&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125423
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131635
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136878
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131069
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131260
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131489
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136826
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136856
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138678
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139519
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140066
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140590
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140899
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141764
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141667
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141482
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140968
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140935
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141891
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141866
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142619
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142674
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142994
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143319
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125424
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130992
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131681
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131835
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137106
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137320
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138734
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140598
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143612
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137094
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141893
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142336
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142422
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142676
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143616

Bill Comments

feedback