LA HB599 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 187.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 187.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to motions for summary judgment (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to motions for summary judgment (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 599 FINAL PASSAGE (#859) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Vote on HB 599 FINAL PASSAGE (#79) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House Vote on HB 599 FINAL PASSAGE (#79) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 187. |
2014-05-22 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-14 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-13 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-25 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2014-03-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-17 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |