LA HB598 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to psychologists
Title
Provides relative to psychologists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 598 FINAL PASSAGE (#994) (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2024. |
2024-05-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |