LA HB597 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for evidence in personal injury claims

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for evidence in personal injury claims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 597 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#710) (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 597 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 597 FINAL PASSAGE (#404) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-15HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-14SenateVeto message from the Governor received and read.
2020-06-12HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 68, nays 23, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported with amendments (8-6).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB597&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163748
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173981
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175669
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178592
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173064
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173881
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174891
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176731
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177986
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178420
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1163758
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174061
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175686
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181947
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186289
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175662
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177655

Bill Comments

feedback