LA HB597 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the Pastor Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the Pastor Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 597 FINAL PASSAGE (#381) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2016-04-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-04-19HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-04-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016.
2016-04-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-04-12HouseReported with amendments (7-3-1).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2016-03-04HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
2016-03-04HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2016-03-04HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=HB597&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=982499
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=993658
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995974
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=992880
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=993547
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=993905
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995619
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995841
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995937
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995915
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=982601
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=993738
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995984
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=995935

Bill Comments

feedback