LA HB597 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Effective date: July 8, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Effective date: July 8, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Converts the Angel Investor Tax Credit Program to the Angel Investor Rebate Program and provides for the rebate program (EN -$20,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Converts the Angel Investor Tax Credit Program to the Angel Investor Rebate Program and provides for the rebate program (EN -$20,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 597, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#919) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 597, CO-AUTHORS (#977) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 597, FINAL PASSAGE (#976) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on HB 597, GRANTING SENATE PERMISSION (#906) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 597, 2/3 vote (#945) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 597, FINAL PASSAGE (#473) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 597, CO-AUTHORS (#977) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 597, FINAL PASSAGE (#976) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on HB 597, GRANTING SENATE PERMISSION (#906) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 597, 2/3 vote (#945) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 597, FINAL PASSAGE (#473) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Effective date: July 8, 2011. | |
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 414. | |
2011-06-24 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. | |
2011-06-22 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/23/2011. | |
2011-06-22 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-22 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-22 | By a vote of 90 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. | |
2011-06-22 | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-21 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-19 | Read by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2011-06-19 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |
2011-06-08 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | |
2011-06-08 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-08 | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. | |
2011-06-06 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2011. | |
2011-06-06 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-02 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | |
2011-05-02 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-28 | Read by title. |