LA HB596 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the concealed carrying of firearms (RE1 DECREASE SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the concealed carrying of firearms (RE1 DECREASE SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 596 FINAL PASSAGE (#239) (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 596 AMENDMENT # 2080 BY MCCORMICK MOTION TO ADOPT (#238) (Y: 29 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-02SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-01SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2021-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-05HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseReported with amendments (8-4-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB596&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212133
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218752
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221557
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213793
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218600
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218836
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218995
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221304
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219815
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229966
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230309
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212139
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217691
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218810
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219596
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221698
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222372
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230546
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232053
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221360
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221388

Bill Comments

feedback