LA HB594 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Becomes HB 833.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Becomes HB 833.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the distribution and sale of vehicles
Title
Provides with respect to the distribution and sale of vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Becomes HB 833. |
2015-04-27 | House | Reported by substitute (12-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |