LA HB594 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to discovery procedures for certain evidence in certain criminal proceedings
Title
Provides relative to discovery procedures for certain evidence in certain criminal proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 594, FINAL PASSAGE (#1296) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 594, FINAL PASSAGE (#464) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 594, FINAL PASSAGE (#464) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 404. | |
2012-05-24 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-22 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-22 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-05-10 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-09 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-08 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-24 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2012-04-23 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-19 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-12 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/19/2012. | |
2012-04-12 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-11 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled. |