LA HB593 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the prescriptive period for child support judgments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the prescriptive period for child support judgments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 593 FINAL PASSAGE (#494) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 593 FINAL PASSAGE (#322) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-15HouseReported with amendments (9-0-1).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback