LA HB593 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: June 29, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: June 29, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for automation of the motor vehicle inspection process (EN DECREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
To provide for automation of the motor vehicle inspection process (EN DECREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 593 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#800) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 593 FINAL PASSAGE (#577) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 593 FINAL PASSAGE (#331) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 593 FINAL PASSAGE (#577) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 593 FINAL PASSAGE (#331) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | House | Effective date: June 29, 2015. |
2015-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 344. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2015-06-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015. |
2015-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |