LA HB591 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the membership of the Louisiana Sickle Cell Commission
Title
Provides relative to the membership of the Louisiana Sickle Cell Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 591 ADOPT (#736) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 591 MOTION TO ADOPT (#771) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 591 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#709) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 591 FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 591 HB 591 BY LARVADAIN (#81) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 591 MOTION TO ADOPT (#771) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 591 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#709) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 591 FINAL PASSAGE (#568) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 591 HB 591 BY LARVADAIN (#81) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Effective date: 06/11/2020. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 280. |
2020-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2020-06-01 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Barrow, Price, and Fred Mills. |
2020-06-01 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2020-05-31 | House | House conferees appointed: Larvadain, Bagley, and Gary Carter. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2020-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2020-05-29 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20. |
2020-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |